WV SB561 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-11 - Approved by Governor 3/23/2023 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-11 - Approved by Governor 3/23/2023 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to relate to the administration of the West Virginia Drinking Water Treatment Revolving Fund. The bill modifies the Water Development Authority and Water Development Board. The bill removes a reference of the federal Safe Drinking Water Act from an area of code. The bill provides for the state administration of the federal Safe Drinking Water Act. Finally, the bill transfers state administration of the West Virginia Drinking Water Treatment Revolving Fund from the Department of Health and Human Resources to the Department of Environmental Protection.
Title
Relating to administration of WV Drinking Water Treatment Revolving Fund Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-11 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2023 (Roll No. 592) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-11 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 592) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - House - Effective July 1, 2023 (Roll No. 684) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 683) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 291) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-11 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 592) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - House - Effective July 1, 2023 (Roll No. 684) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 683) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 291) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-11 | House | Approved by Governor 3/23/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/23/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/23/2023 |
2023-03-11 | Senate | To Governor 3/16/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-16 | Senate | To Governor 3/16/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | To Governor 3/16/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | House | House received Senate message |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2023 (Roll No. 592) |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 592) |
2023-03-11 | Senate | House Message received |
2023-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-03-10 | House | Effective July 1, 2023 (Roll No. 684) |
2023-03-10 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-03-10 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 683) |
2023-03-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-10 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-03-09 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-03-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-09 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-03-08 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-03-08 | House | Immediate consideration |
2023-03-08 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2023-02-28 | House | To House Finance |
2023-02-28 | House | To Finance |
2023-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 291) |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-25 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 2/25/2023 with right to amend |
2023-02-25 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-24 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Committee substitute for committee substitute reported |
2023-02-09 | Senate | To Finance |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2023-02-03 | Senate | To Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-02-03 | Senate | To Agriculture and Natural Resources then Finance |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 13C | 1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
16 | 13C | 2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
16 | 13C | 3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
16 | 13C | 4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
16 | 13C | 5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
16 | 13C | 6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
22 | 36 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 36 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 36 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 36 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 36 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 36 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 36 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |