WV SB557 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB557


Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-28 - To House Health and Human Resources
Pending: House Health & Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]


Relating to Senior Farmers' Market Nutrition Program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Relating to Senior Farmers' Market Nutrition Program


Roll Calls

2018-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 216) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]


2018-02-28HouseTo House Health and Human Resources
2018-02-28HouseTo Health and Human Resources then Finance
2018-02-28HouseIntroduced in House
2018-02-27SenateOrdered to House
2018-02-27SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 216)
2018-02-27SenateRead 3rd time
2018-02-27SenateOn 3rd reading
2018-02-26SenateCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2018-02-26SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-26SenateOn 2nd reading
2018-02-23SenateReported do pass, with amendment
2018-02-23SenateHaving been read 1st time 2/21/18
2018-02-21SenateOn 2nd reading to Finance
2018-02-21SenateRead 1st time
2018-02-21SenateImmediate consideration
2018-02-21SenateReported do pass, but first to Finance
2018-02-15SenateTo Agriculture and Rural Development
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced in Senate
2018-02-15SenateTo Agriculture and Rural Development
2018-02-15SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB557 (Carry Over) 2017-03-27 - On 2nd reading to Finance


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
19113New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources

Bill Comments