WV SB557 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Effective Date
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Effective Date
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to clarify the procedures for filling vacancies in the State Legislature.
Title
Clarifying legislative vacancy procedures
Sponsors
Sen. Douglas Facemire [D] | Sen. Dan Foster [D] | Sen. Jeffrey Kessler [D] | Sen. Joseph Minard [D] |
Sen. Michael Oliverio [D] | Sen. Robert Plymale [D] | Sen. John Unger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-11 | Effective Date | |
2010-04-22 | Chapter 78, Acts, Regular Session, 2010 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 4/2/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-04-02 | Approved by Governor 4/2/10 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 4/2/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 4/1/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 4/1/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-04-01 | To Governor 4/1/10 | |
2010-03-13 | Completed legislative action | |
2010-03-13 | House received Senate message | |
2010-03-13 | Communicated to House | |
2010-03-13 | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 87) | |
2010-03-13 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-03-13 | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2010-03-13 | Passed House (Roll No. 346) | |
2010-03-13 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-13 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2010-03-13 | On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar | |
2010-03-11 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-11 | From House Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2010-03-10 | Read 1st time | |
2010-03-10 | Immediate consideration | |
2010-03-10 | With amendment, do pass | |
2010-03-04 | To House Judiciary | |
2010-03-04 | To Judiciary | |
2010-03-04 | Introduced in House | |
2010-03-03 | Ordered to House | |
2010-03-03 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 26) | |
2010-03-03 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-03 | On 3rd reading | |
2010-03-02 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-02 | On 2nd reading | |
2010-03-01 | Read 1st time | |
2010-03-01 | On 1st reading | |
2010-02-26 | Committee substitute reported | |
2010-02-12 | To Judiciary | |
2010-02-12 | To Judiciary | |
2010-02-12 | Introduced in Senate | |
2010-02-12 | To Judiciary | |
2010-02-12 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4468 (Same As) 2010-02-12 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 10 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=557&year=2010&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |