WV SB552 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Chapter 271, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Chapter 271, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to tax sale process
Title
Relating to tax sale process
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-12 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 551) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 632) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 290) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 632) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 290) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Senate | Chapter 271, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-12 | House | Approved by Governor 3/30/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/30/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-12 | House | To Governor 3/17/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-17 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/2022 |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 551) |
2022-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-03-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-12 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-12 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 632) |
2022-03-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-12 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-12 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2022-03-12 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-12 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2022-03-12 | House | On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar |
2022-03-11 | House | Amendment pending |
2022-03-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-11 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-11 | House | Placed on Special Calender |
2022-03-11 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2022-03-10 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2022-03-10 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-09 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-03-09 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-08 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2022-03-03 | House | To House Judiciary |
2022-03-03 | House | To Judiciary |
2022-03-03 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 290) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2022-02-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading to Judiciary |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary |
2022-02-01 | Senate | To Finance |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-01 | Senate | To Finance |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4524 (Similar To) 2022-02-16 - To House Finance