WV SB552 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 130, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 130, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring contracts of $25,000 or more be competitively bid
Title
Requiring contracts of $25,000 or more be competitively bid
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Maynard [R] | Sen. Sue Cline [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-29 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 358) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 416) (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 415) (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 396) (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 395) (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 57) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 416) (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 415) (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 396) (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 395) (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 57) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 130, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/24/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-24 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/24/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/24/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/10/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/10/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-10 | Senate | To Governor 3/10/20 |
2020-03-02 | House | House received Senate message |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2020-02-29 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2020-02-29 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 358) |
2020-02-29 | Senate | Senate concurred in House changed effective date |
2020-02-29 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-02-28 | House | Completed legislative action |
2020-02-28 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-28 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 416) |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 415) |
2020-02-28 | House | House reconsidered amendment and withdrew |
2020-02-28 | House | House reconsidered effective date and passage (Voice vote) |
2020-02-28 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 396) |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 395) |
2020-02-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-28 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-27 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-02-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-27 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-26 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-26 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-25 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2020-02-04 | House | To House Government Organization |
2020-02-04 | House | To Government Organization |
2020-02-04 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 57) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-03 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-01-31 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-01-30 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2020-01-21 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-21 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22C | 1 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |