WV SB545 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 38, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 38, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Removing certain prior bank overdraft approval by director or executive officer
Title
Removing certain prior bank overdraft approval by director or executive officer
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 424) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 10) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 10) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Senate | Chapter 38, Acts, Regular Session, 2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Approved by Governor 3/24/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/24/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/24/15 |
2015-03-16 | House | To Governor 3/16/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-16 | Senate | To Governor 3/16/15 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-10 | House | Completed legislative action |
2015-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 424) |
2015-03-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-10 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-09 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-07 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-03-07 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-06 | House | 2nd reference dispensed |
2015-03-06 | House | Do pass |
2015-03-02 | House | To House Banking and Insurance |
2015-03-02 | House | To Banking and Insurance then Finance |
2015-03-02 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-03-01 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2015-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 10) |
2015-03-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-01 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2015-02-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-28 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-02-27 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2015-02-23 | Senate | To Finance |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-02-23 | Senate | To Finance |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
31A | 4 | 26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |