WV SB536 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-08 - Chapter 147, Acts, Regular Session, 2008
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-08 - Chapter 147, Acts, Regular Session, 2008
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to exempt vehicles operated by the Supreme Court of Appeals from registration requirements for state cars.
Title
Exempting Supreme Court probation officers' vehicles from certain registration requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-08 | Chapter 147, Acts, Regular Session, 2008 | |
2008-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/27/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/27/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-27 | Approved by Governor 3/27/08 | |
2008-03-16 | To Governor 3/18/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-16 | To Governor 3/18/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-18 | To Governor 3/18/08 | |
2008-03-08 | House Message received | |
2008-03-08 | Completed legislative action | |
2008-03-08 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-03-08 | Passed House (Roll No. 479) | |
2008-03-08 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-03-08 | From House Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2008-03-08 | From Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar | |
2008-03-04 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-03-04 | From House Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2008-03-03 | Read 1st time | |
2008-03-03 | Taken up for further consideration | |
2008-03-03 | Do pass | |
2008-02-27 | To House Judiciary | |
2008-02-27 | To Judiciary | |
2008-02-27 | Introduced in House | |
2008-02-26 | Ordered to House | |
2008-02-26 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 13) | |
2008-02-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-02-26 | On 3rd reading | |
2008-02-25 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-02-25 | On 2nd reading | |
2008-02-22 | Read 1st time | |
2008-02-22 | On 1st reading | |
2008-02-21 | Reported do pass | |
2008-02-18 | To Judiciary | |
2008-02-18 | Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary | |
2008-02-01 | To Transportation and Infrastructure | |
2008-02-01 | To Transportation and Infrastructure then Judiciary | |
2008-02-01 | Introduced in Senate | |
2008-02-01 | To Transportation and Infrastructure then Judiciary | |
2008-02-01 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17A | 3 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |