WV SB535 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-26 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-26 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Dedicating increased court fees in criminal cases to fund training programs for law-enforcement officers
Title
Dedicating increased court fees in criminal cases to fund training programs for law-enforcement officers
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Trump [R] | Sen. John Unger [D] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. Mike Woelfel [D] |
Sen. Robert Plymale [D] | Sen. Sue Cline [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-23 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 182) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 182) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 182) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-02-26 | House | To Judiciary then Finance |
2018-02-26 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 182) |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 182) |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-23 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-22 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-02-21 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2018-02-14 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-14 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 29 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |