WV SB524 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 188, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 188, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to Board of Barbers and Cosmetologists
Title
Rewriting Board of Barbers and Cosmetologists article
Sponsors
Sen. Craig Blair [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-12 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 566) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment as amended and passed bill (Roll No. 409) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 436) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House rejected (Roll No. 425) (Y: 31 N: 65 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 101) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment as amended and passed bill (Roll No. 409) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 436) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House rejected (Roll No. 425) (Y: 31 N: 65 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 101) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Senate | Chapter 188, Acts, Regular Session, 2016 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/1/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/1/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | Approved by Governor 4/1/2016 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | To Governor 3/28/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-28 | Senate | To Governor 3/28/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | To Governor 3/28/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-12 | House | Completed legislative action |
2016-03-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-12 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 566) |
2016-03-12 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendment as amended and passed bill (Roll No. 409) |
2016-03-11 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-09 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 436) |
2016-03-09 | House | House reconsidered passage (Voice) |
2016-03-09 | House | House reconsidered its action |
2016-03-09 | House | Motion to reconsider rejection |
2016-03-08 | House | House rejected (Roll No. 425) |
2016-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-07 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-03-07 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-03-05 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-04 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2016-02-16 | House | To House Government Organization |
2016-02-16 | House | To Government Organization |
2016-02-16 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 101) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-15 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/11/16 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-02-10 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2016-02-05 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-02-05 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 27 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 27 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 27 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 27 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 27 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 27 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 27 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 27 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 27 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 27 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 27 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 27 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 27 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 27 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 27 | 8a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 27 | 8b | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 27 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |