WV SB522 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Vetoed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Creating Special Road Repair Fund

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating Special Road Repair Fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-09 - House - Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 755) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 752) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 522) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 550) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 606) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 605) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 271) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 271) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-09HouseVetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateVetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-27SenateVetoed by Governor 3/27/19
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-22SenateTo Governor 3/22/19
2019-03-09SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-09HouseCompleted legislative action
2019-03-09HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-09HouseEffective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 755)
2019-03-09HouseHouse further considered bill
2019-03-09HouseHouse adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 752)
2019-03-09HouseConference report received-House
2019-03-09HouseHouse received Senate message
2019-03-09SenateSenate requests House to concur
2019-03-09SenateEffective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 550)
2019-03-09SenateSenate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 550)
2019-03-09HouseConference report filed - House
2019-03-09SenateConference report filed - Senate
2019-03-09SenateTo conference
2019-03-09SenateCommunicated to House
2019-03-09SenateSenate agreed to conference and appoints conferees: Blair, Smith, Plymale
2019-03-09SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-09HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-09HouseHouse appointed conferees: Criss, Linville, Barrett
2019-03-09HouseHouse refused to recede and requested conference(Voice vote)
2019-03-09HouseHouse received Senate message
2019-03-09SenateCommunicated to House
2019-03-09SenateSenate refused to concur; requested House recede(Voice vote)
2019-03-09SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-08HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-08HouseEffective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 606)
2019-03-08HouseTitle amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-03-08HousePassed House (Roll No. 605)
2019-03-08HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-08HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-07HouseCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-03-07HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-07HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-06HouseRead 1st time
2019-03-06HouseImmediate consideration
2019-03-06HouseWith amendment, do pass
2019-02-28HouseTo House Finance
2019-02-28HouseTo Finance
2019-02-28HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-27SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-27SenateEffective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 271)
2019-02-27SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 271)
2019-02-27SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-27SenateAmended on 3rd reading (Voice vote)
2019-02-26SenateLaid over on 3rd reading 2/26/19
2019-02-26SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-25SenateFloor amendments adopted (Voice vote)
2019-02-25SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-25SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-23SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-23SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-22SenateCommittee substitute for committee substitute reported
2019-02-18SenateTo Finance
2019-02-18SenateCommittee substitute reported, but first to Finance
2019-02-05SenateTo Transportation and Infrastructure
2019-02-05SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-02-05SenateTo Transportation and Infrastructure then Finance
2019-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1113A3Amended CodeCitation Text
1113A3aAmended CodeCitation Text
172A6bNew CodeSee Bill Text
17311New CodeSee Bill Text
17301New CodeSee Bill Text
17302New CodeSee Bill Text
17303New CodeSee Bill Text
17304New CodeSee Bill Text
17305New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=522&year=2019&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB522%20INTR.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=522
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB522%20SUB1.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=522
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB522%20SUB2.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=522
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB522%20SUB2%20ENG.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=522
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB522%20SUB2%20ENG2.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=522
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB522%20SUB2%20enr.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=522
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/senate/02-27-0271.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00605.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00606.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/senate/03-09-0550.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/senate/03-09-0522.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00752.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00755.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback