WV SB510 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Effective Date
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Effective Date
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to extend the sunset provision relating to indexing Division of Natural Resources license and stamp fees, and to make technical corrections.
Title
Extending DNR license and stamp fees sunset provision
Sponsors
Sen. John Fanning [D] | Sen. John Unger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-11 | Effective Date | |
2010-04-22 | Chapter 142, Acts, Regular Session, 2010 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 3/24/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-24 | Approved by Governor 3/24/10 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 3/24/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 3/23/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-23 | To Governor 3/23/10 | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 3/23/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-13 | Completed legislative action | |
2010-03-13 | House Message received | |
2010-03-13 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-03-13 | Passed House (Roll No. 370) | |
2010-03-13 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-13 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-03-11 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-11 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-03-10 | Read 1st time | |
2010-03-10 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2010-03-09 | Do pass | |
2010-03-03 | To House Finance | |
2010-03-03 | To Finance | |
2010-03-03 | Introduced in House | |
2010-03-02 | Ordered to House | |
2010-03-02 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 21) | |
2010-03-02 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-02 | On 3rd reading | |
2010-03-01 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-01 | On 2nd reading | |
2010-02-26 | Read 1st time | |
2010-02-26 | On 1st reading | |
2010-02-25 | Reported do pass | |
2010-02-16 | To Finance | |
2010-02-16 | Reported do pass, but first to Finance | |
2010-02-08 | To Natural Resources | |
2010-02-08 | To Natural Resources then Finance | |
2010-02-08 | Introduced in Senate | |
2010-02-05 | To Natural Resources then Finance | |
2010-02-08 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4286 (Similar To) 2010-02-18 - To House Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2 | 42 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=510&year=2010&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |