WV SB509 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-08 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-08 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Imposing statutory liens on certain fire insurance proceeds
Title
Imposing statutory liens on certain fire insurance proceeds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 24) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | House | To House Judiciary |
2013-04-08 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2013-04-04 | House | To House Banking and Insurance |
2013-04-04 | House | To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary |
2013-04-04 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 24) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-03 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-02 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2013-04-01 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2013-03-26 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Government Organization |
2013-03-13 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-03-13 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance then Government Organization |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 22 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |