WV SB508 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-30 - Referred to Rules on 2nd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-30 - Referred to Rules on 2nd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removing mandate Board of Risk and Insurance Management purchase liability insurance for Division of Corrections
Title
Removing mandate Board of Risk and Insurance Management purchase liability insurance for Division of Corrections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Rules on 2nd reading |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Motion |
2020-01-30 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-01-29 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2020-01-16 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-16 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4496 (Similar To) 2020-04-15 - Chapter 200, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 12 | 5a | Amended Code | Citation Text |