WV SB507 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Chapter 52, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Chapter 52, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to repeal West Virginia EDGE which became unnecessary last year with the passage of the dual enrollment pilot program in HB2005.
Title
Relating to repeal of WV EDGE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 230) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 103) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 103) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Chapter 52, Acts, Regular Session, 2024 |
2024-03-01 | House | Approved by Governor 2/29/2024 - House Journal |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Approved by Governor 2/29/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Approved by Governor 2/29/2024 |
2024-02-26 | House | To Governor 2/23/2024 - House Journal |
2024-02-23 | Senate | To Governor 2/23/2024 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | House Message received |
2024-02-20 | House | Completed legislative action |
2024-02-20 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-02-20 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 230) |
2024-02-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-20 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-19 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-16 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-02-16 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-15 | House | Do pass |
2024-02-08 | House | To House Education |
2024-02-08 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 103) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-07 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-06 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-02-05 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2024-01-22 | Senate | To Education |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-01-19 | Senate | To Education |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 13 | 1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
18 | 13 | 2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
18 | 13 | 3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
18 | 13 | 4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
18 | 13 | 5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |