WV SB504 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Chapter 83, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Chapter 83, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to modify elements of a felony offense pertaining to when a school employee or volunteer engages in sexual intercourse, intrusion, or contact with students.
Title
Relating to felony offense of sexual intercourse, intrusion, or contact with student
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 377) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 464) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 97) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 464) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 97) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Chapter 83, Acts, Regular Session, 2024 |
2024-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/22/24 - House Journal |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/22/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/22/2024 |
2024-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/13/2024 - House Journal |
2024-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/13/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-13 | Senate | To Governor 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | House received Senate message |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 377) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | House Message received |
2024-03-05 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-03-05 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 464) |
2024-03-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-05 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-04 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-03-04 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-03-04 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2024-03-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-04 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-01 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-03-01 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-29 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2024-02-07 | House | To House Judiciary |
2024-02-07 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 97) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-06 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-05 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-02-02 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2024-01-22 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-01-19 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 8B | 11b | Amended Code | Citation Text |