WV SB488 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-22 - To House Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-22 - To House Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring WV Secondary School Activities Commission manage hypertropic cardiomyopathy
Title
Requiring WV Secondary School Activities Commission manage hypertrophic cardiomyopathy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 150) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-22 | House | To House Education |
2016-02-22 | House | To Education |
2016-02-22 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-02-20 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2016-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 150) |
2016-02-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-20 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-02-20 | Senate | Unanimous consent to amend |
2016-02-20 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-19 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-02-18 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendments |
2016-02-03 | Senate | To Education |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-02-03 | Senate | To Education |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |