WV SB476 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 187, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 187, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require the number of managed care organizations administered by the Bureau of Medical Services in the Mountain Health Trust be set at four. The bill also requires that the organization have an established adult and youth reentry plan for persons released from jail or prison.
Title
Exempting managed care contracts from purchasing requirements
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Tarr [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-08 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 424) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 424) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 539) (Y: 86 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 538) (Y: 80 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 313) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 424) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 539) (Y: 86 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 538) (Y: 80 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 313) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Chapter 187, Acts, Regular Session, 2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/29/23 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/29/23 |
2023-03-11 | House | To Governor 3/10/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-10 | Senate | To Governor 3/10/2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 424) |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 424) |
2023-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2023-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-03-07 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 539) |
2023-03-07 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-03-07 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 538) |
2023-03-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-07 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-03-07 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-03-07 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2023-03-07 | House | On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar |
2023-03-06 | House | Amendment pending |
2023-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-06 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-03-04 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-03-04 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2023-03-03 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2023-03-01 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2023-03-01 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2023-03-01 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 313) |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-28 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-27 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-02-25 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-02-25 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2023-01-25 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-01-25 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |