WV SB476 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Chapter 268, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Chapter 268, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to imposition of minimum severance tax on coal
Title
Relating to imposition of minimum severance tax on coal
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Tarr [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 480) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 479) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 113) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 113) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 479) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 113) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 113) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Senate | Chapter 268, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Became law without Governor's signature - Senate Journal |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Became law 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-12 | House | Became law without Governor's signature- House Journal |
2022-03-12 | House | To Governor 3/15/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/15/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-15 | Senate | To Governor 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-11 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-03-10 | House | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-10 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 480) |
2022-03-10 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 479) |
2022-03-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-10 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-09 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-08 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-03-08 | House | Immediate consideration |
2022-03-08 | House | Do pass |
2022-02-15 | House | To House Finance |
2022-02-15 | House | To Finance |
2022-02-15 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 113) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 113) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-14 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-11 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-02-10 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2022-01-28 | Senate | To Finance |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2022-01-24 | Senate | To Energy, Industry, and Mining |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-01-24 | Senate | To Energy, Industry, and Mining then Finance |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4411 (Similar To) 2022-02-02 - To House Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 12B | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |