WV SB467 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-08 - Chapter 61, Acts, Regular Session, 2008
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-08 - Chapter 61, Acts, Regular Session, 2008
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to re-authorize and make technical changes to the Dam Safety Rehabilitation Revolving Fund and the loan program to be implemented by the Department of Environmental Protection and to provide the Department with additional mechanisms to promote dam safety.
Title
Reauthorizing Dam Safety Rehabilitation Revolving Fund
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Foster [D] | Sen. Jon Hunter [D] | Sen. Evan Jenkins [D] | Sen. Shirley Love [D] |
Sen. Robert Plymale [D] | Sen. Roman Prezioso [D] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. John Unger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-08 | Chapter 61, Acts, Regular Session, 2008 | |
2008-03-16 | Approved by Governor 4/1/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-04-01 | Approved by Governor 4/1/08 | |
2008-03-16 | Approved by Governor 4/1/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-16 | To Governor 3/26/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-16 | To Governor 3/26/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-26 | To Governor 3/26/08 | |
2008-03-08 | House received Senate message | |
2008-03-08 | Completed legislative action | |
2008-03-08 | Communicated to House | |
2008-03-08 | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 56) | |
2008-03-07 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-03-07 | Passed House (Roll No. 425) | |
2008-03-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-03-07 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2008-03-06 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2008-03-06 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-03-06 | From House Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2008-03-05 | Read 1st time | |
2008-03-05 | Immediate consideration | |
2008-03-05 | With amendment, do pass | |
2008-03-04 | To House Finance | |
2008-03-04 | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance | |
2008-02-26 | To House Judiciary | |
2008-02-26 | To Judiciary then Finance | |
2008-02-26 | Introduced in House | |
2008-02-25 | Ordered to House | |
2008-02-25 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 13) | |
2008-02-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-02-25 | On 3rd reading | |
2008-02-22 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-02-22 | On 2nd reading | |
2008-02-21 | Read 1st time | |
2008-02-21 | On 1st reading | |
2008-02-20 | Committee substitute reported | |
2008-02-07 | To Finance | |
2008-02-07 | Reported do pass, but first to Finance | |
2008-01-28 | To Natural Resources | |
2008-01-28 | To Natural Resources then Finance | |
2008-01-28 | Introduced in Senate | |
2008-01-28 | To Natural Resources then Finance | |
2008-01-28 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=467&year=2008&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |