WV SB464 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Chapter 114, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Chapter 114, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Developing and implementing program to regulate source-separated organic material waste
Title
Requiring composting of organic materials and commercial composting products comply with WV Fertilizer Law
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Plymale [D] | Sen. Robert Beach [D] | Sen. Mike Woelfel [D] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] |
Sen. Stephen Baldwin [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 549) (Y: 89 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 264) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 264) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Senate | Chapter 114, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-04-10 | House | Approved by Governor 4/26/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/26/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/26/21 |
2021-04-10 | House | To Governor 4/16/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | To Governor 4/16/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-16 | Senate | To Governor 4/16/21 |
2021-04-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-04-09 | House | Completed legislative action |
2021-04-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-04-09 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 549) |
2021-04-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-09 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-04-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-08 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-04-07 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-04-07 | House | Immediate consideration |
2021-04-07 | House | Do pass |
2021-04-01 | House | To House Judiciary |
2021-04-01 | House | To Judiciary |
2021-04-01 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 264) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-31 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-30 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Committee substitute for committee substitute reported |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Motion |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2021-02-26 | Senate | To Economic Development |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-02-26 | Senate | To Economic Development |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed for introduction |