WV SB456 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-25 - To House Energy, Industry and Labor, Economic Development and Small Business
Pending: House Energy, Industry and Labor, Economic Development and Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-25 - To House Energy, Industry and Labor, Economic Development and Small Business
Pending: House Energy, Industry and Labor, Economic Development and Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to allow the Marketing and Communications Office of the Department of Commerce, with the approval of the secretary, to sell partnerships, sponsorships or advertising in its publications, events or promotions.
Title
Relating to responsibilities of Marketing and Communications Office of Department of Commerce
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-25 | To House Energy, Industry and Labor, Economic Development and Small Business | |
2011-02-25 | To Energy, Industry and Labor, Economic Development and Small Business then Finance | |
2011-02-25 | Introduced in House | |
2011-02-25 | Ordered to House | |
2011-02-25 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 9) | |
2011-02-25 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 9) | |
2011-02-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-02-25 | On 3rd reading | |
2011-02-24 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-02-24 | On 2nd reading | |
2011-02-23 | Reported do pass | |
2011-02-23 | Having been read 1st time, prior proceedings, 2/16/11 | |
2011-02-16 | On 2nd reading to Finance | |
2011-02-16 | Read 1st time | |
2011-02-16 | On 1st reading | |
2011-02-16 | Immediate consideration | |
2011-02-16 | Reported do pass, but first to Finance | |
2011-02-08 | To Economic Development | |
2011-02-08 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-02-08 | To Economic Development then Finance | |
2011-02-08 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5B | 1 | 1a | Amended Code | Citation Text |