WV SB449 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 243, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 243, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to add the Natural Resource Police Officers Retirement System and public charter schools for federal pick-up contribution purposes.
Title
Updating terms for Natural Resources Police Officers Retirement System and retirement systems for charter schools
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Nelson [R] | Sen. Vince Deeds [R] | Sen. Mike Oliverio [R] | Sen. Mark Hunt [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 417) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 506) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 144) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 506) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 144) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Chapter 243, Acts, Regular Session, 2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | Approved by Governor 3/23/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/23/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/23/2023 |
2023-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/9/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/9/2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 417) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2023-03-06 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-03-06 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 506) |
2023-03-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-06 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-03-04 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-03-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-04 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-03-03 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-03-03 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2023-03-02 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2023-02-21 | House | To House Finance |
2023-02-21 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2023-02-09 | House | To House Pensions and Retirement |
2023-02-09 | House | To Pensions and Retirement then Finance |
2023-02-09 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 144) |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-08 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Laid over on 1st reading 2/3/2023 |
2023-02-03 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2023-02-02 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2023-01-24 | Senate | To Pensions |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-01-24 | Senate | To Pensions then Finance |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB3235 (Similar To) 2023-02-02 - To House Pensions and Retirement
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 10C | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 10C | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 10C | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |