WV SB449 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 24, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 24, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Supplemental appropriation from State Fund, General Revenue to Department of Administration, Public Defender Services
Title
Supplemental appropriation from State Fund, General Revenue to Department of Administration, Public Defender Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-24 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 174) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 173) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 83) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 83) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 173) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 83) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 83) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Senate | Chapter 24, Acts, Regular Session, 2016 |
2016-03-03 | House | Approved by Governor 3/1/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/1/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/1/16 |
2016-03-01 | House | To Governor 2/29/16 - House Journal |
2016-02-29 | Senate | To Governor 2/29/16 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-02-24 | House | Completed legislative action |
2016-02-24 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-02-24 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 174) |
2016-02-24 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 173) |
2016-02-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-24 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-23 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-22 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-02-22 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-20 | House | Do pass |
2016-02-12 | House | To House Finance |
2016-02-15 | House | To Finance |
2016-02-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 83) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 83) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-11 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-10 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-02-09 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2016-02-01 | Senate | To Finance |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-02-01 | Senate | To Finance |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4154 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - To House Finance