WV SB444 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-02 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-02 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to protection of nonfamily or nonhousehold members from sexual offenses, stalking and harassment
Title
Relating to protection of nonfamily or nonhousehold members from violations of personal safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-02 | To House Judiciary | |
2011-03-02 | To Judiciary then Finance | |
2011-03-02 | Introduced in House | |
2011-03-01 | Ordered to House | |
2011-03-01 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) | |
2011-03-01 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-01 | On 3rd reading | |
2011-02-28 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-02-28 | On 2nd reading | |
2011-02-25 | Read 1st time | |
2011-02-25 | On 1st reading | |
2011-02-24 | Committee substitute reported | |
2011-02-07 | To Judiciary | |
2011-02-07 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-02-07 | To Judiciary | |
2011-02-07 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB3041 (Same As) 2011-02-07 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
53 | 8 | 1001 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 1101 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 1102 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 1103 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 201 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 202 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 203 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 204 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 205 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 301 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 302 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 303 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 304 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 305 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 306 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 307 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 308 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 309 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 310 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 311 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 401 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 501 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 502 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 503 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 504 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 505 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 506 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 507 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 508 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 601 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 701 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 801 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 802 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 901 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 902 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 903 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 904 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 10A | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 10A | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 10A | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 10A | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 10A | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 10A | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 10A | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 10A | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 10A | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 10A | 18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 10A | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 10A | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 10A | 20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 10A | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 10A | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 10A | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 10A | 24 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 10A | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 10A | 26 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 10A | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 10A | 28 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 10A | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 10A | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 10A | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 10A | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 10A | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 10A | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 10A | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 1C | 17c | Amended Code | Citation Text |