WV SB439 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-11 - Communicated to Senate
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-11 - Communicated to Senate
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to permit the Superintendent of the State Police to consult with the Insurance Commissioner instead of the executive director of the Workers' Compensation Commission in order to defray medical costs. The bill also changes the maximum medical care costs schedule from that of the Workers' Compensation Commission to the Insurance Commissioner.
Title
Permitting State Police Superintendent consult with Insurance Commissioner
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-11 | Communicated to Senate | |
2009-04-11 | Effective July 1, 2009 (Roll No. 451) | |
2009-04-11 | Passed House (Roll No. 450) | |
2009-04-11 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-11 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2009-04-10 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2009-04-10 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-10 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2009-04-09 | Read 1st time | |
2009-04-09 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2009-04-08 | With amendment, do pass | |
2009-04-06 | To House Judiciary | |
2009-04-06 | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary | |
2009-03-31 | To House Government Organization | |
2009-03-31 | To Government Organization then Judiciary | |
2009-03-31 | Introduced in House | |
2009-03-31 | Ordered to House | |
2009-03-31 | Effective July 1, 2009 (Roll No. 8) | |
2009-03-31 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 8) | |
2009-03-31 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-03-31 | On 3rd reading | |
2009-03-30 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-03-30 | On 2nd reading | |
2009-03-27 | Read 1st time | |
2009-03-27 | On 1st reading | |
2009-03-26 | Committee substitute reported | |
2009-03-04 | To Government Organization | |
2009-03-04 | To Government Organization | |
2009-03-04 | Introduced in Senate | |
2009-03-04 | To Government Organization | |
2009-03-04 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB3210 (Same As) 2009-03-18 - To House Government Organization
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=439&year=2009&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |