WV SB434 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-14 - Communicated to House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-14 - Communicated to House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require approval of televised racing days and simulcast contracts by Horsemen’s Benevolent and Protective Association; reduce racing days; provide additional reason for reduction in live racing dates; amend provisions relating to notification of mutual clerks and Horsemen’s Benevolent and Protective Association of request to reduce racing dates; allow commission determination of reduction in live racing dates at special meeting; and eliminate certain restrictions on moneys placed in purse fund.
Title
Relating to horse racing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-14 - Senate - Motion to concur rejected (Roll No. 65) (Y: 8 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 564) (Y: 92 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 13) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 564) (Y: 92 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 13) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-14 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2015-03-14 | Senate | Senate refused to concur; requested House recede(Voice vote) |
2015-03-14 | Senate | Motion to concur rejected (Roll No. 65) |
2015-03-14 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-14 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-14 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-03-14 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 564) |
2015-03-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-14 | House | Amended on 3rd reading |
2015-03-14 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2015-03-14 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-13 | House | Laid over on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 3/14/15 |
2015-03-13 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-12 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-03-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-12 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-11 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-03-11 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-10 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2015-03-06 | House | To House Finance |
2015-03-06 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2015-02-27 | House | To House Judiciary |
2015-02-27 | House | To Judiciary then Finance |
2015-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 13) |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-02-27 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-26 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-02-25 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment |
2015-02-06 | Senate | To Finance |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-02-06 | Senate | To Finance |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2575 (Similar To) 2015-02-03 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 23 | 12b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 23 | 13b | Amended Code | Citation Text |