WV SB430 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 272, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 272, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to ensure that all spending units utilize the State Treasurer's contracts and agreements with financial institutions for banking goods and services.
Title
Relating to State Treasurer’s authority to contract with financial institutions for banking goods and services
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Tarr [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-03 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 442) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 211) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 211) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Chapter 272, Acts, Regular Session, 2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | Approved by Governor 3/28/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/28/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | To Governor 3/8/2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | To Governor 3/8/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-06 | Senate | House Message received |
2023-03-03 | House | Completed legislative action |
2023-03-03 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-03-03 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 442) |
2023-03-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-03 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-03-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-02 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-03-01 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-03-01 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-28 | House | 2nd reference dispensed |
2023-02-28 | House | Do pass |
2023-02-24 | House | To House Government Organization |
2023-02-24 | House | To Government Organization then Judiciary |
2023-02-24 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 211) |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-20 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-17 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-02-16 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2023-01-23 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-01-23 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12 | 1 | 1A | New Code | See Bill Text |
12 | 2 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |