WV SB430 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-03 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-03 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Filing civil petition for expungement of certain criminal records
Title
Filing civil petition for expungement of certain criminal records
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-03 | To House Judiciary | |
2011-03-03 | To Judiciary | |
2011-03-03 | Introduced in House | |
2011-03-02 | Ordered to House | |
2011-03-02 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 13) | |
2011-03-02 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-02 | On 3rd reading | |
2011-03-01 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-01 | On 2nd reading | |
2011-02-28 | Read 1st time | |
2011-02-28 | On 1st reading | |
2011-02-28 | Immediate consideration | |
2011-02-28 | Committee substitute reported | |
2011-02-04 | To Judiciary | |
2011-02-04 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-02-04 | To Judiciary | |
2011-02-04 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB3128 (Similar To) 2011-02-15 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 11 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |