WV SB428 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 124, Acts, Regular Session, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 124, Acts, Regular Session, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize the Commissioner of the Division of Motor Vehicles to issue no more than five Class A registration plates to the division for vehicles to be used by investigators for commercial driver examination fraud investigation and drivers license issuance fraud detection and fraud prevention. The bill authorizes the commissioner to issue Class A registration plates to Medicaid Fraud Control Unit and the West Virginia Insurance Fraud Unit. The bill deletes the outdated requirement that municipalities provide the commissioner with lists of vehicles used by their law-enforcement departments. The bill also provides for penalties.
Title
Relating to registration plates for governmental vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 356) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Chapter 124, Acts, Regular Session, 2012 | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 4/2/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 4/2/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-04-02 | Approved by Governor 4/2/12 | |
2012-03-16 | To Governor 3/29/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-16 | To Governor 3/29/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-29 | To Governor 3/29/12 | |
2012-03-10 | House Message received | |
2012-03-10 | Completed legislative action | |
2012-03-10 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-03-10 | Passed House (Roll No. 356) | |
2012-03-10 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-03-10 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-03-09 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-03-09 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-03-08 | Read 1st time | |
2012-03-08 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2012-03-07 | Do pass | |
2012-02-20 | To House Finance | |
2012-02-20 | To Finance | |
2012-02-20 | Introduced in House | |
2012-02-17 | Ordered to House | |
2012-02-17 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) | |
2012-02-17 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-02-17 | On 3rd reading | |
2012-02-16 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-02-16 | On 2nd reading | |
2012-02-15 | Read 1st time | |
2012-02-15 | On 1st reading | |
2012-02-14 | Reported do pass | |
2012-02-01 | To Finance | |
2012-02-01 | Reported do pass, but first to Finance | |
2012-01-25 | To Transportation and Infrastructure | |
2012-01-25 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-01-25 | To Transportation and Infrastructure then Finance | |
2012-01-25 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4286 (Same As) 2012-02-09 - To House Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17A | 3 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |