WV SB428 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-16 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-16 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Increasing fees charged by clerk of circuit court for medical professional liability actions
Title
Increasing and reallocating certain circuit court fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-18 - House - Override Veto (Y: 57 N: 24 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-12 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 27 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-12 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 27 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-16 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-04 | Chapter 35, Acts, Regular Session, 2011 | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 3/31/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 3/31/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-31 | Approved by Governor 3/31/11 | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/28/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-28 | To Governor 3/28/11 | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/28/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-18 | Completed legislative action | |
2011-03-18 | House Message received | |
2011-03-18 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-03-18 | Repassed House to meet the objections of the Governor (Roll No. 507) | |
2011-03-18 | House concurred in Senate amendment (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-18 | House received Senate message | |
2011-03-18 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2011-03-18 | Senate amended, repassed bill as result of Governor's Veto (Roll No. 6) | |
2011-03-18 | Senate reconsidered action (voice vote) | |
2011-03-18 | Vetoed by Governor 3/18/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-18 | Vetoed by Governor 3/18/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-18 | Vetoed by Governor 3/18/11 | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/17/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/17/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-17 | To Governor 3/17/11 | |
2011-03-12 | Completed legislative action | |
2011-03-12 | House received Senate message | |
2011-03-12 | Communicated to House | |
2011-03-12 | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 50) | |
2011-03-12 | House Message received | |
2011-03-12 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-03-12 | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-12 | Passed House (Roll No. 386) | |
2011-03-12 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-12 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-03-11 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-11 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-11 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-03-10 | Read 1st time | |
2011-03-10 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2011-03-09 | 2nd reference dispensed | |
2011-03-09 | With amendment, do pass | |
2011-03-01 | To House Judiciary | |
2011-03-01 | To Judiciary then Finance | |
2011-03-01 | Introduced in House | |
2011-02-28 | Ordered to House | |
2011-02-28 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 12) | |
2011-02-28 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-02-28 | On 3rd reading | |
2011-02-25 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-02-25 | On 2nd reading | |
2011-02-24 | Reported do pass | |
2011-02-24 | Having been read 1st time, prior proceedings, 02/18/11 | |
2011-02-18 | On 2nd reading to Finance | |
2011-02-18 | Read 1st time | |
2011-02-18 | On 1st reading | |
2011-02-18 | Immediate consideration | |
2011-02-18 | Reported do pass, but first to Finance | |
2011-02-04 | To Judiciary | |
2011-02-04 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-02-04 | To Judiciary then Finance | |
2011-02-04 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB3127 (Similar To) 2011-02-15 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 1 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
59 | 1 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
59 | 1 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |