WV SB426 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Modernizing certain alcohol laws
Title
Modernizing certain alcohol laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 207) (Y: 17 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-02-28 | House | To Judiciary then Finance |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 207) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-27 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-26 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-02-23 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2018-01-30 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-01-30 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 16 | 11b | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 16 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 16 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 16 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 16 | 6a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 16 | 6b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 16 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 1 | 5a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 2 | 17a | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 3 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 3A | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 3A | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 4 | 3a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 4 | 3b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 5 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 6 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 6 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 6 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 7 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 7 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 7 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 7 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 7 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 7 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 8 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 8 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 8 | 34 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 8 | 27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 1 | 3ss | Repealed Code | Citation Text |