WV SB424 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-12 - Reordered on the calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-12 - Reordered on the calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Regulating oil and gas wells
Title
Creating Natural Gas Horizontal Well Control Act
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Beach [D] | Sen. Mike Green [D] | Sen. Mike Hall [R] | Sen. Jeffrey Kessler [D] |
Sen. Orphy Klempa [D] | Sen. Herb Snyder [D] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-12 | Reordered on the calendar | |
2011-03-12 | On 3rd reading with restricted right to amend, Special Calender | |
2011-03-11 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-11 | From House Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2011-03-10 | With amendment, do pass | |
2011-03-09 | To House Finance | |
2011-03-09 | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance | |
2011-03-07 | Committed to Judiciary then Finance on 2nd reading | |
2011-03-07 | Reported by the Clerk | |
2011-03-07 | From House Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2011-03-03 | Read 1st time | |
2011-03-03 | Immediate consideration | |
2011-03-03 | Reference dispensed | |
2011-03-03 | Introduced in House | |
2011-03-02 | Ordered to House | |
2011-03-02 | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 11) | |
2011-03-02 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-02 | Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-02 | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-02 | Floor amendment rejected (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-02 | On 3rd reading with right to amend | |
2011-03-01 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-01 | On 2nd reading | |
2011-02-28 | Read 1st time | |
2011-02-28 | On 1st reading | |
2011-02-28 | Immediate consideration | |
2011-02-28 | Committee substitute for committee substitute reported | |
2011-02-24 | On 2nd reading to Judiciary | |
2011-02-24 | Read 1st time | |
2011-02-24 | On 1st reading | |
2011-02-24 | Immediate consideration | |
2011-02-24 | Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary | |
2011-02-07 | Senator Hall requests to be removed as sponsor of bill | |
2011-02-04 | To Energy, Industry and Mining | |
2011-02-04 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-02-04 | To Energy, Industry and Mining then Judiciary | |
2011-02-04 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB3042 (Same As) 2011-02-07 - To House Judiciary
HB2878 (Similar To) 2011-03-12 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
HB2878 (Similar To) 2011-03-12 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 6 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 6 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 6 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 6 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 6 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 6 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 6 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 6 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 6 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 6 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 6 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 6 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 6 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 6 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 6 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 6 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 6 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 6 | 26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 6 | 27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 6 | 29 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 6 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 6 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 6 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 6 | 32 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 6 | 33 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 6 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 6 | 36 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 6 | 37 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 6 | 38 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 6 | 39 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 6 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 6 | 41 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 6 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 6 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 6 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 6 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 6 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 6A | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 6A | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 6A | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 6A | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 6A | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 6A | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 6A | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 6A | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 6A | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 6A | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 6A | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 6A | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 6A | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 6A | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 6A | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 6A | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 6A | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 7 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22C | 7 | 1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22C | 7 | 2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22C | 7 | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22C | 8 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22C | 8 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22C | 9 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22C | 9 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22C | 9 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22C | 9 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22C | 9 | 7a | New Code | See Bill Text |