WV SB415 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB415

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 101, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Permitting wagering on certain professional or collegiate sports events authorized as WV Lottery Sports Wagering activities

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permitting wagering on certain professional or collegiate sports events authorized as WV Lottery sports wagering activities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-03 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 302) (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-03 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 302) (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 286) (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 285) (Y: 77 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 154) (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 154) (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Floor amendment adopted (Roll No. 150) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Motion to lie over adopted (Roll No. 143) (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23SenateChapter 101, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
2018-03-10HouseBecame law without Governor's signature- House Journal
2018-03-10SenateBecame law without Governor's signature - Senate Journal
2018-03-10SenateBecame law 3/9/18
2018-03-05HouseTo Governor 3/3/18 - House Journal
2018-03-03SenateTo Governor 3/3/18
2018-03-05HouseHouse received Senate message
2018-03-03SenateCompleted legislative action
2018-03-03SenateCommunicated to House
2018-03-03SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 302)
2018-03-03SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 302)
2018-03-03SenateHouse Message received
2018-03-02HouseCommunicated to Senate
2018-03-02HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 286)
2018-03-02HouseTitle amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2018-03-02HousePassed House (Roll No. 285)
2018-03-02HouseRead 3rd time
2018-03-02HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2018-03-01HouseCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2018-03-01HouseAmendment to committee amendment rejected (Voice vote)
2018-03-01HouseRead 2nd time
2018-03-01HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2018-02-28HouseRead 1st time
2018-02-28HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2018-02-27HouseWith amendment, do pass
2018-02-21HouseTo House Finance
2018-02-21HouseTo Finance
2018-02-21HouseIntroduced in House
2018-02-20SenateOrdered to House
2018-02-20SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 154)
2018-02-20SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 154)
2018-02-20SenateRead 3rd time
2018-02-20SenateOn 3rd reading
2018-02-19SenateFloor amendment adopted (Roll No. 150)
2018-02-19SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-16SenateLaid over on 2nd reading 2/16/18
2018-02-16SenateMotion to lie over adopted (Roll No. 143)
2018-02-16SenateOn 2nd reading
2018-02-15SenateRead 1st time
2018-02-15SenateOn 1st reading
2018-02-14SenateReported do pass
2018-02-08SenateTo Finance
2018-02-08SenateCommittee substitute reported, but first to Finance
2018-01-29SenateTo Judiciary
2018-01-29SenateIntroduced in Senate
2018-01-29SenateTo Judiciary then Finance
2018-01-29SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB415 (Carry Over) 2017-02-23 - To Energy, Industry and Mining
HB4396 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - To House Finance

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2922D1New CodeSee Bill Text
2922D10New CodeSee Bill Text
2922D11New CodeSee Bill Text
2922D12New CodeSee Bill Text
2922D13New CodeSee Bill Text
2922D14New CodeSee Bill Text
2922D15New CodeSee Bill Text
2922D16New CodeSee Bill Text
2922D17New CodeSee Bill Text
2922D18New CodeSee Bill Text
2922D19New CodeSee Bill Text
2922D2New CodeSee Bill Text
2922D20New CodeSee Bill Text
2922D21New CodeSee Bill Text
2922D22New CodeSee Bill Text
2922D23New CodeSee Bill Text
2922D24New CodeSee Bill Text
2922D25New CodeSee Bill Text
2922D3New CodeSee Bill Text
2922D4New CodeSee Bill Text
2922D5New CodeSee Bill Text
2922D6New CodeSee Bill Text
2922D7New CodeSee Bill Text
2922D8New CodeSee Bill Text
2922D9New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=415&year=2018&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB415%20INTR.htm&yr=2018&sesstype=RS&i=415
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB415%20SUB1.htm&yr=2018&sesstype=RS&i=415
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB415%20SUB1%20ENG.htm&yr=2018&sesstype=RS&i=415
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB415%20SUB1%20ENR.htm&yr=2018&sesstype=RS&i=415
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2018/RS/votes/senate/02-16-0143.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2018/RS/votes/senate/02-19-0150.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2018/RS/votes/senate/02-20-0154.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2018/RS/votes/house/00285.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2018/RS/votes/house/00286.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2018/RS/votes/senate/03-03-0302.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback