WV SB407 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB407

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 34, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Licensing and approval of child care programs

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Licensing and approval of child care programs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 455) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 114) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23SenateChapter 34, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
2018-03-10SenateApproved by Governor 3/27/18 - Senate Journal
2018-03-27SenateApproved by Governor 3/27/18
2018-03-10HouseApproved by Governor 3/27/18 - House Journal
2018-03-10HouseTo Governor 3/21/18 - House Journal
2018-03-10SenateTo Governor 3/21/18 - Senate Journal
2018-03-21SenateTo Governor 3/21/18
2018-03-10SenateHouse Message received
2018-03-09HouseCompleted legislative action
2018-03-09HouseCommunicated to Senate
2018-03-09HousePassed House (Roll No. 455)
2018-03-09HouseRead 3rd time
2018-03-09HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2018-03-08HouseRead 2nd time
2018-03-08HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2018-03-07HouseRead 1st time
2018-03-07HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2018-03-06HouseDo pass
2018-02-15HouseTo House Health and Human Resources
2018-02-15HouseTo Health and Human Resources
2018-02-15HouseIntroduced in House
2018-02-14SenateOrdered to House
2018-02-14SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 114)
2018-02-14SenateRead 3rd time
2018-02-14SenateOn 3rd reading
2018-02-13SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-13SenateOn 2nd reading
2018-02-12SenateRead 1st time
2018-02-12SenateOn 1st reading
2018-02-09SenateReported do pass, with title amendment
2018-02-07SenateTo Government Organization
2018-02-07SenateReported do pass, but first to Government Organization
2018-01-29SenateTo Health and Human Resources
2018-01-29SenateIntroduced in Senate
2018-01-29SenateTo Health and Human Resources then Government Organization
2018-01-27SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB407 (Carry Over) 2017-02-23 - To Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
491203Amended CodeCitation Text
491206Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback