WV SB404 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-22 - Referred to Finance on 2nd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-22 - Referred to Finance on 2nd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to clarify that a child who is physically healthy and presumed safe is a neglected child if he or she is habitually absent from school without good cause. This bill provides an exemption for parents whose children are receiving home instruction.
Title
Defining certain habitually absent student as neglected child
Sponsors
Sen. Donald Cookman [D] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. Ronald Miller [D] | Sen. Bob Williams [D] |
Sen. Rocky Fitzsimmons [D] | Sen. Mike Green [D] | Sen. Corey Palumbo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Finance on 2nd reading |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 3/21/13 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-03-20 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2013-03-13 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2013-03-01 | Senate | To Education |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-03-01 | Senate | To Education then Judiciary |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
49 | 1 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |