WV SB383 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Chapter 25, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Chapter 25, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose this bill is to permit certain owners of residential real estate a limited exemption from the licensing requirements of the West Virginia Safe Mortgage Licensing Act for self-financed home financing. The bill grants that exemption to owners of residential real estate who in any twelve consecutive month period make no more than five residential mortgage loans to purchasers of residential real estate for all or part of the purchase price of the property against which the mortgage is secured.
Title
Permitting certain residential real estate owners limited exemptions from licensing requirements for self-financed mortgages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-07 - House - Effective July 1, 2014 (Roll No. 325) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 324) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2014 (Roll No. 3) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 324) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2014 (Roll No. 3) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 25, Acts, Regular Session, 2014 |
2014-03-14 | House | Approved by Governor 3/18/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/18/14 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/18/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-17 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/14 |
2014-03-14 | House | To Governor 3/17/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-03-07 | House | Completed legislative action |
2014-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-03-07 | House | Effective July 1, 2014 (Roll No. 325) |
2014-03-07 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 324) |
2014-03-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-07 | House | On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-06 | House | On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2014-03-05 | House | On 1st reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-04 | House | Do pass |
2014-02-28 | House | To House Judiciary |
2014-02-28 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2014-02-21 | House | To House Banking and Insurance |
2014-02-21 | House | To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary |
2014-02-21 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2014 (Roll No. 3) |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-02-21 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-02-20 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-02-19 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2014-02-07 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary |
2014-01-20 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-01-20 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4116 (Same As) 2014-01-09 - To House Banking and Insurance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
31 | 17 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
31 | 17A | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |