WV SB376 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to add persons who have been adjudicated as a juvenile delinquent for conduct related to qualifying offenses to comply with the registration requirements of the Sex Offender Registration Act.
Title
Relating generally to Sex Offender Registration Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 235) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | To House Judiciary |
2017-03-29 | House | To Judiciary |
2017-03-29 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 235) |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-28 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-25 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 3/25/17 |
2017-03-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2017-02-21 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-02-21 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2915 (Similar To) 2017-03-10 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 12 | 1a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 12 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 12 | 2a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 12 | 2b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 12 | 3a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 12 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |