WV SB376 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Permitting unit owners' associations institute legal action to collect dues
Title
Permitting unit owners' associations institute legal action to collect dues
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-12 - House - Passage (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-10 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-04 | Chapter 28, Acts, Regular Session, 2011 | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 3/31/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 3/31/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-31 | Approved by Governor 3/31/11 | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/24/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-24 | To Governor 3/24/11 | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/24/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-12 | Completed legislative action | |
2011-03-12 | House Message received | |
2011-03-12 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-03-12 | Passed House (Roll No. 363) | |
2011-03-12 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-12 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-03-11 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-11 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-03-10 | Read 1st time | |
2011-03-10 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2011-03-09 | Do pass | |
2011-02-16 | To House Judiciary | |
2011-02-16 | To Judiciary | |
2011-02-16 | Introduced in House | |
2011-02-15 | Ordered to House | |
2011-02-15 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 2) | |
2011-02-15 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-02-15 | On 3rd reading | |
2011-02-14 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-02-14 | On 2nd reading | |
2011-02-11 | Read 1st time | |
2011-02-11 | On 1st reading | |
2011-02-10 | Reported do pass | |
2011-02-01 | To Judiciary | |
2011-02-01 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-02-01 | To Judiciary | |
2011-02-01 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB3109 (Similar To) 2011-02-11 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36B | 3 | 102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |