WV SB371 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 161, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 161, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to reform aspects of the criminal justice system to improve public safety and address the growing prison overcrowding and substance abuse problems in this state.
Title
Relating to prison overcrowding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-13 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 68) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 68) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 71) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 307) (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 306) (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 317) (Y: 81 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 286) (Y: 33 N: 65 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-11 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 285) (Y: 36 N: 62 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-11 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 284) (Y: 35 N: 62 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-11 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 283) (Y: 37 N: 61 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-11 - House - Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 282) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 4) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 4) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 1) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 68) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 71) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 307) (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 306) (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 317) (Y: 81 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 286) (Y: 33 N: 65 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-11 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 285) (Y: 36 N: 62 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-11 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 284) (Y: 35 N: 62 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-11 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 283) (Y: 37 N: 61 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-11 - House - Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 282) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 4) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 4) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 1) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | Senate | Chapter 161, Acts, Regular Session, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | House | Approved by Governor 5/2/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor 5/2/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Approved by Governor 5/2/13 |
2013-04-17 | House | To Governor 5/1/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | To Governor 5/1/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-05-01 | Senate | To Governor 5/1/13 |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 71) |
2013-04-13 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-12 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2013-04-12 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 317) |
2013-04-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-12 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-11 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2013-04-11 | House | Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 286) |
2013-04-11 | House | Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 285) |
2013-04-11 | House | Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 284) |
2013-04-11 | House | Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 283) |
2013-04-11 | House | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 282) |
2013-04-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-11 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-10 | House | Read 1st time |
2013-04-10 | House | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2013-04-09 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2013-04-09 | House | To House Finance |
2013-04-09 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2013-03-22 | House | To House Judiciary |
2013-03-22 | House | To Judiciary then Finance |
2013-03-22 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 1) |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-03-21 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-03-20 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2013-03-19 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Committee substitute for committee substitute reported |
2013-03-08 | Senate | To Finance |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2013-02-26 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-02-26 | Senate | To Judiciary then Finance |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2726 (Same As) 2013-02-26 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 1 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
28 | 5 | 27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
31 | 20 | 5g | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 20 | 5h | New Code | See Bill Text |
61 | 7 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
62 | 11A | 1a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
62 | 11B | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
62 | 11C | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 11C | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
62 | 11C | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
62 | 11C | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
62 | 12 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
62 | 12 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
62 | 12 | 14a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
62 | 12 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
62 | 12 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
62 | 12 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
62 | 12 | 29 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 12 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
62 | 12 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
62 | 12 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
62 | 15 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
62 | 15 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
62 | 15 | 6a | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 15 | 6b | New Code | See Bill Text |
64 | 10 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 10 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 10 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 10 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 10 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |