WV SB369 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 186, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 186, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to generic drug products
Title
Relating to generic drug products
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 595) (Y: 71 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 72) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 72) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 186, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-22 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/19 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-08 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 595) |
2019-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-03-06 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-05 | House | Do pass |
2019-02-27 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-02-27 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2019-02-05 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2019-02-05 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2019-02-05 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 72) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-04 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-01 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-01-31 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2019-01-21 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-21 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2811 (Similar To) 2019-02-01 - To House Health and Human Resources
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 5 | 12b | Amended Code | Citation Text |