WV SB369 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-09 - Senator Maroney requests to be removed as sponsor of bill
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-09 - Senator Maroney requests to be removed as sponsor of bill
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to powers and authority of newly created divisions of Administrative Services and Corrections and Rehabilitation within MAPS
Title
Relating to powers and authority of newly created divisions of Administrative Services and Corrections and Rehabilitation within MAPS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-09 | Senate | Senator Maroney requests to be removed as sponsor of bill |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senator Romano requests to be removed as sponsor of bill |
2018-01-24 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-01-24 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4338 (Similar To) 2018-04-16 - Chapter 107, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15A | 1 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 1 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 1 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 1 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 1 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 2 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 2 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 2 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 2 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 2 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 2 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 2 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 2 | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 2 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 2 | 18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 2 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 2 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 2 | 20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 2 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 2 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 2 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 2 | 24 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 2 | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 2 | 26 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 2 | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 2 | 28 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 2 | 29 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 2 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 2 | 30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 2 | 31 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 2 | 32 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 2 | 33 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 2 | 34 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 2 | 35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 2 | 36 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 2 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 2 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 2 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 2 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 2 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 2 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 3 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 3 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 3 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 3 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 3 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 3 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 3 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 4 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 4 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 4 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 4 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 4 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 4 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 5 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 5 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 5 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 5 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 5 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 5 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 5 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 6 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 6 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 6 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 12A | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
25 | 1 | 1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
25 | 1 | 11 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
25 | 1 | 11a | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
25 | 1 | 11b | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
25 | 1 | 11c | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
25 | 1 | 11d | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
25 | 1 | 11e | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
25 | 1 | 11f | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
25 | 1 | 13 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
25 | 1 | 14 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
25 | 1 | 15 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
25 | 1 | 16 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
25 | 1 | 16a | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
25 | 1 | 17 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
25 | 1 | 18 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
25 | 1 | 19 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
25 | 1 | 1a | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
25 | 1 | 20 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
25 | 1 | 21 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
25 | 1 | 22 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
25 | 1 | 3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
25 | 1 | 3a | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
25 | 1 | 3b | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
25 | 1 | 3c | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
25 | 1 | 4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
25 | 1 | 5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
25 | 1 | 5a | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
25 | 1 | 6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
25 | 1 | 7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
25 | 1 | 8 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
28 | 5 | 23 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
28 | 5 | 24 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
28 | 5 | 7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
28 | 5 | 8a | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
6 | 7 | 2a | Amended Code | Citation Text |