WV SB366 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 182, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 182, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to enact the Patient Protection and Transparency Act which requires information to be given to, and provides protections for, persons who purchase insurance through the West Virginia Health Benefit Exchange or an exchange website operated by the federal government.
Title
Creating Patient Protection and Transparency Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 6) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 418) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 9) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 418) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 9) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Senate | Chapter 182, Acts, Regular Session, 2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Approved by Governor 3/18/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/18/15 |
2015-03-16 | House | To Governor 3/16/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-16 | Senate | To Governor 3/16/15 |
2015-03-12 | House | House received Senate message |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 6) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate concurred in House title amendment (Voice vote) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-10 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-03-10 | House | House further considered bill |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 418) |
2015-03-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-10 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-09 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-07 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-03-07 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-06 | House | Do pass |
2015-03-05 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2015-03-05 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2015-03-05 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 9) |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-04 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-03 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2015-02-24 | Senate | To Finance |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2015-01-29 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-01-29 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance then Finance |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 50 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 50 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 50 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 50 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |