WV SB366 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-25 - To House Health and Human Resources
Pending: House Health & Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-25 - To House Health and Human Resources
Pending: House Health & Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Transferring CHIP from Department of Administration to DHHR
Title
Transferring CHIP from Department of Administration to DHHR
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-24 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2014 (Roll No. 6) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 6) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 6) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-25 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2014-02-25 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Finance |
2014-02-25 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2014 (Roll No. 6) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 6) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-02-24 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-02-21 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Having been read 1st time 2/18/14 |
2014-02-18 | Senate | On 2nd reading to Judiciary |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2014-01-16 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-01-16 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4213 (Same As) 2014-01-17 - To House Health and Human Resources
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 16B | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 16B | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |