WV SB360 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 49, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 49, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to third-party litigation financing
Title
Relating to third-party litigation financing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 560) (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 370) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 457) (Y: 95 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 434) (Y: 11 N: 87 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 173) (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 370) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 457) (Y: 95 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 434) (Y: 11 N: 87 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 173) (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 49, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-22 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/19 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-07 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 560) |
2019-03-07 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 370) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-05 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 457) |
2019-03-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-05 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-04 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-04 | House | Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 434) |
2019-03-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-04 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-02 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-03-02 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-01 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2019-02-20 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-02-20 | House | To Judiciary |
2019-02-20 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 173) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-20 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-19 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-18 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2019-01-21 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-21 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46A | 6N | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
46A | 6N | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
46A | 6N | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
46A | 6N | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
46A | 6N | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
46A | 6N | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
46A | 6N | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
46A | 6N | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
46A | 6N | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
46A | 6O | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
46A | 6O | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
46A | 6O | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
46A | 6O | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
46A | 6O | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
46A | 6O | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
46A | 6O | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
46A | 6O | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
46A | 6O | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |