WV SB352 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 55, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation acquiring and disposing of goods and commodities

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation acquiring and disposing of services, goods, and commodities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-09 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 707) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 693) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 471) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 471) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 594) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 593) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 106) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateChapter 55, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
2019-03-09HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-25SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/19
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/20/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/20/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-20SenateTo Governor 3/20/19
2019-03-09SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-09HouseCompleted legislative action
2019-03-09HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-09HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 707)
2019-03-09HouseHouse further considered bill
2019-03-09HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 693)
2019-03-09HouseHouse received Senate message
2019-03-09SenateSenate requests House to concur
2019-03-09SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 471)
2019-03-09SenateSenate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 471)
2019-03-09SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-08HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-08HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 594)
2019-03-08HousePassed House (Roll No. 593)
2019-03-08HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-08HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-07HouseCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-03-07HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-07HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-06HouseRead 1st time
2019-03-06HouseImmediate consideration
2019-03-06HouseWith amendment, do pass
2019-02-25HouseTo House Finance
2019-02-25HouseWith amendment, do pass, but first to Finance
2019-02-12HouseTo House Government Organization
2019-02-12HouseTo Government Organization then Finance
2019-02-12HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-11SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-11SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 106)
2019-02-11SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-11SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-08SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-08SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-07SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-07SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-06Senate2nd reference dispensed
2019-02-06SenateCommittee substitute reported, but first to Finance
2019-01-18SenateTo Government Organization
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-18SenateTo Government Organization then Finance
2019-01-18SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2772 (Similar To) 2019-01-30 - To House Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15A314Amended CodeCitation Text
15A314aNew CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=352&year=2019&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB352%20INTR.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=352
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB352%20SUB1.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=352
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB352%20SUB1%20ENR.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=352
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/senate/02-11-0106.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00593.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00594.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/senate/03-09-0471.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00693.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00707.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback