WV SB335 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-16 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-16 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing consumers sales and service tax, use tax and personal income tax
Title
Creating the 2017 Tax Reform Act
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Karnes [R] | Sen. Mitch Carmichael [R] | Sen. Jeffrey Mullins [R] | Sen. Mark Maynard [R] |
Sen. Ryan Weld [R] | Sen. Charles Clements [R] | Sen. Ryan Ferns [R] | Sen. Sue Cline [R] |
Sen. Randy Smith [R] | Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] | Sen. Mike Azinger [R] | Sen. Chandler Swope [R] |
Sen. Craig Blair [R] | Sen. Ed Gaunch [R] | Sen. Tom Takubo [R] | Sen. Gregory Boso [R] |
Sen. Kenny Mann [R] | Sen. Charles Trump [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Senate | To Finance |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senator Maroney requests to be removed as sponsor of bill |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senator Rucker requests to be removed as sponsor of bill |
2017-02-16 | Senate | To Select Committee on Tax Reform |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-02-16 | Senate | To Select Committee on Tax Reform then Finance |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 13A | 26 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13A | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13DD | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13DD | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13DD | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13DD | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13EE | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13EE | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13EE | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13EE | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 15 | 34 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 15A | 30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 15C | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 15C | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 15C | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 15C | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 15C | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 15C | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 15C | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 15C | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 15C | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 15C | 18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 15C | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 15C | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 15C | 20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 15C | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 15C | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 15C | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 15C | 24 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 15C | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 15C | 26 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 15C | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 15C | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 15C | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 15C | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 15C | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 15C | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 15C | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 15C | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 16 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 17 | 4b | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 19 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 19 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 21 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 21 | 4g | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 21 | 8a | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 21 | 97 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 21A | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 21A | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 21A | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 21A | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 21A | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 21A | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 21A | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 24 | 23a | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 24 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 3A | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
8 | 1 | 5a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 13C | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |