WV SB334 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Chapter 171, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Chapter 171, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Agriculture rule relating to feeding of untreated garbage to swine
Title
Authorizing miscellaneous agencies and boards to promulgate rules
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-12 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 688) (Y: 90 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-12 - House - House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 687) (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-12 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 545) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-12 - Senate - Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 545) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 561) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 560) (Y: 81 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 48) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 48) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-12 - House - House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 687) (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-12 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 545) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-12 - Senate - Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 545) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 561) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 560) (Y: 81 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 48) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 48) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Senate | Chapter 171, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-12 | House | Approved by Governor 3/30/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/30/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-12 | House | To Governor 3/17/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-17 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/2022 |
2022-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-03-12 | House | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-12 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 688) |
2022-03-12 | House | House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 687) |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 545) |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 545) |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Conference report filed - Senate |
2022-03-12 | House | Conference report filed - House |
2022-03-12 | Senate | To conference |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Senate agreed to conference and appoints conferees: Sypolt, Rucker, Jeffries |
2022-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-03-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-12 | House | House appointed conferees: Foster, Kimes, Young |
2022-03-12 | House | House refused to recede and requested conference(Voice vote) |
2022-03-12 | House | House received Senate message |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Senate refused to concur; requested House recede(Voice vote) |
2022-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-03-11 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-11 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 561) |
2022-03-11 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-11 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 560) |
2022-03-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-11 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-10 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-10 | House | Amendment to amendment adopted (Voice) |
2022-03-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-10 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-09 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-03-09 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-08 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2022-03-08 | House | To House Government Organization |
2022-03-08 | House | Recommitted to Government Organization |
2022-03-08 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2022-01-27 | House | To House Government Organization |
2022-01-27 | House | To Government Organization |
2022-01-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 48) |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 48) |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-01-26 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-01-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-01-24 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2022-01-17 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-01-17 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4173 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
64 | 9 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |