WV SB331 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Using leashed dogs to track mortally wounded deer or bear
Title
Using leashed dogs to track mortally wounded deer or bear
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Maynard [R] | Sen. Sue Cline [R] | Sen. Randy Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-01 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 57) (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 57) (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 57) (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-02-13 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2019-02-04 | House | To House Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2019-02-04 | House | To Agriculture and Natural Resources then Judiciary |
2019-02-04 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 57) |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 57) |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-01 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-01-31 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-01-30 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-01-16 | Senate | To Natural Resources |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-16 | Senate | To Natural Resources |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2 | 5i | New Code | See Bill Text |