WV SB331 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-17 - Vetoed by Governor 5/3/13 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-17 - Vetoed by Governor 5/3/13 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide the West Virginia Courthouse Facilities Improvement Authority with the ability to issue bonds to raise funds for paying the costs of approved modifications or construction of courthouse facilities; add bond-related activities to the powers of the authority; provide that moneys from the West Virginia Courthouse Facilities Improvement Fund may be disbursed for payment of debt service on bonds; authorize the authority to issue bonds; set circumstances for bond issuance and potential terms of bonds; authorize repayment of debt; permit bonds be secured by trust agreement and set certain parameters; permit refunding bonds; clarify that bonds by the authority are not a pledge of faith and credit of the state, county, municipality or other subdivision of the state; declare bonds issued as negotiable instruments under the Uniform Commercial Code; exempt all bonds by the authority, as well as interest and income thereon, from taxation by the state or any subdivision; declare that certain individuals have no personal liability in relation to issuance of bonds; and grant cumulative authority for exercising certain powers, including if no bonds are issued by the authority.
Title
Permitting Courthouse Facilities Improvement Authority to issue bonds
Sponsors
Sen. Jeffrey Kessler [D] | Sen. John Unger [D] | Sen. Ronald Miller [D] | Sen. William Laird [D] |
Sen. Daniel Hall [D] | Sen. Robert Beach [D] | Sen. Bob Williams [D] | Sen. Robert Plymale [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 314) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-29 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 4) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - House - House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 464) (Y: 86 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 315) (Y: 87 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - Committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 312) (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-29 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 4) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - House - House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 464) (Y: 86 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 315) (Y: 87 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - Committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 312) (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-17 | House | Vetoed by Governor 5/3/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 5/3/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 5/3/13 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | To Governor 4/23/13 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | To Governor 4/23/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-17 | House | To Governor 4/23/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-13 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-12 | House | Completed legislative action |
2013-04-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-12 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 314) |
2013-04-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-12 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-11 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-10 | House | Read 1st time |
2013-04-10 | House | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2013-04-09 | House | Do pass |
2013-04-01 | House | To House Finance |
2013-04-01 | House | To Finance |
2013-04-01 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 4) |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-03-29 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-03-28 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-03-27 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2013-03-14 | Senate | To Finance |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment, but first to Finance |
2013-02-20 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-02-20 | Senate | To Government Organization then Finance |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17C | 14 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 26 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 26 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 26 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 26 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 26 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 26 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 26 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 26 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 26 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 26 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 26 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |