WV SB330 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to higher education personnel generally
Title
Relating to higher education personnel generally
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Beach [D] | Sen. Richard Browning [D] | Sen. Dan Foster [D] | Sen. Evan Jenkins [D] |
Sen. Robert Plymale [D] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. Erik Wells [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-12 - House - Passage (Y: 86 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-10 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-04 | Chapter 79, Acts, Regular Session, 2011 | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 4/5/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 4/5/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-04-05 | Approved by Governor 4/5/11 | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/29/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/29/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-29 | To Governor 3/29/11 | |
2011-03-12 | House received Senate message | |
2011-03-12 | Completed legislative action | |
2011-03-12 | Communicated to House | |
2011-03-12 | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 43) | |
2011-03-12 | House Message received | |
2011-03-12 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-03-12 | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-12 | Passed House (Roll No. 364) | |
2011-03-12 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-12 | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-12 | Deferred | |
2011-03-12 | Amendment reported by the Clerk | |
2011-03-12 | Committee amendment withdrawn (Voice) | |
2011-03-12 | On 3rd reading with restricted right to amend, Special Calender | |
2011-03-11 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-11 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-03-10 | Read 1st time | |
2011-03-10 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2011-03-09 | With amendment, do pass | |
2011-03-01 | To House Finance | |
2011-03-01 | To Finance | |
2011-03-01 | Introduced in House | |
2011-02-28 | Ordered to House | |
2011-02-28 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 7) | |
2011-02-28 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-02-28 | On 3rd reading | |
2011-02-25 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-02-25 | On 2nd reading | |
2011-02-24 | Read 1st time | |
2011-02-24 | On 1st reading | |
2011-02-23 | Reported do pass | |
2011-02-09 | To Finance | |
2011-02-09 | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance | |
2011-01-28 | To Education | |
2011-01-28 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-01-28 | To Education then Finance | |
2011-01-28 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB3017 (Similar To) 2011-02-22 - To House Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12 | 1 | 12d | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 13 | 1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 23 | 4a | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 7 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 1 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 1 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 10 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 19 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 1B | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 1B | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 2A | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 2A | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 2A | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 2B | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 3 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 3 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 3 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 4 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 4 | 2a | New Code | See Bill Text |
18B | 5 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 7 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18B | 7 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 7 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 7 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 7 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18B | 7 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18B | 7 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18B | 7 | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18B | 7 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 7 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 7 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 7 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 7 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 7 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 7 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 7 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 8 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 8 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18B | 8 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 8 | 3a | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18B | 8 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 8 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 8 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 9 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 9 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18B | 9 | 12 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18B | 9 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 9 | 2a | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18B | 9 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 9 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 9 | 5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18B | 9 | 7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18B | 9 | 8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18B | 9 | 9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18B | 9A | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18B | 9A | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18B | 9A | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18B | 9A | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18B | 9A | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18B | 9A | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18B | 9A | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18B | 9A | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19B | 1B | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |